ND SB2215 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to provide for umbilical cord blood donation information.
Title
AN ACT to provide for umbilical cord blood donation information.
Sponsors
Sen. Spencer Berry [R] | Rep. Lois Delmore [D] | Rep. William Devlin [R] | Sen. Ralph Kilzer [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Sen. Margaret Sitte [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/26 | |
2011-04-26 | Signed by Governor 04/26 | |
2011-04-22 | Signed by President | |
2011-03-17 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-03-16 | Returned to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 | |
2011-03-10 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 | |
2011-03-09 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee | |
2011-02-11 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-10 | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 0 | |
2011-02-08 | Committee Hearing 09:15 | |
2011-02-03 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |