ND SB2202 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Second reading, failed, lacks const. majority yeas 043 nays 041
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-23 - Second reading, failed, lacks const. majority yeas 043 nays 041
Summary
Introduced by Rep. R. Kelsch, L. Meier, Wolf A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of school enrollment and attendance.
Title
Introduced by Rep. R. Kelsch, L. Meier, Wolf A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative council study of school enrollment and attendance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-23 | Second reading, failed, lacks const. majority yeas 043 nays 041 | |
2009-03-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 009 n 005 | |
2009-03-10 | Committee Hearing 09:45 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education | |
2009-02-19 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on table | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 026 nays 020 | |
2009-02-18 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 010 n 003 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-23 | Rereferred to Appropriations | |
2009-01-23 | Amendment adopted | |
2009-01-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-01-20 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2202.html |