ND SB2193 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-06 - Signed by Governor 04/05
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 11-15-33, subsection 2 of section 15-10-17, and section 40-20-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to jurisdiction of law enforcement officers; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Jurisdiction of law enforcement officers; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Larry Luick [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] |
Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 71 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/05 |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-31 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-24 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2017-03-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 71 nays 21 |
2017-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 3 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |