ND SB2192 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Amerman, Keiser, Klemin A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to Vietnam Veterans' Day; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Amerman, Keiser, Klemin A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to Vietnam Veterans' Day; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-13 | Concurred | |
2009-03-23 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-23 | Second reading passed, y 085 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-03-20 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-19 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-03-05 | Committee Hearing 01:15 | |
2009-02-25 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans A | |
2009-01-29 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-28 | Second reading passed, y 046 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-01-27 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-26 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 005 n 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-09 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2192.html |