ND SB2191 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 32-19-41 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the disposal of abandoned personal property.
Title
The disposal of abandoned personal property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/23 |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2021-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6 |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 3 1 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |