ND SB2186 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-19 and a new section to chapter 54-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to providing schools with information, programs, and resources regarding student safety and crisis awareness issues to be posted in school common areas and a student safety and crisis awareness reporting program; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
Providing schools with information, programs, and resources regarding student safety and crisis awareness issues to be posted in school common areas and a student safety and crisis awareness reporting program; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Gary Lee [R] | Rep. Mary Adams [D] |
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Michelle Strinden [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 31 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Conference committee appointed Heinert Hoverson Hager |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Rust Fors Marcellais |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2019-03-27 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 4 |
2019-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-03-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-03-15 | House | Rereferred to Education |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-02-27 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2019-02-15 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 1 |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2019-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |