ND SB2184 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-25 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 20.1-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to big game hunting licenses for hunter education volunteer instructors.
Title
Big game hunting licenses for hunter education volunteer instructors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 6 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-25 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 6 nays 41 |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2021-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |