ND SB2181 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 50-09-29, 50-24.1-02.6, and 50-24.1-41 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public assistance for pregnant women.
Title
Public assistance for pregnant women.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Sen. Sean Cleary [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Rep. Emily O'Brien [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Rep. Matthew Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/29 |
2023-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/28 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-25 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2023-04-20 | House | Conference committee appointed McLeod Frelich Strinden |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee appointed K. Roers Cleary Dever |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-04-17 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 87 nays 3 |
2023-04-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-04-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 19 1 3 |
2023-04-13 | House | Committee Hearing 03:30 |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2023-03-28 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-03-28 | House | Amendment adopted |
2023-03-27 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-03-27 | House | Committee Hearing 11:31 |
2023-03-20 | House | Committee Hearing 03:58 |
2023-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-02-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |
2023-02-14 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 1 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 0 1 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:15 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:55 |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |