ND SB2179 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 54-44-04 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to duties of the director of the office of management and budget.
Title
Duties of the director of the office of management and budget.
Sponsors
Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] | Sen. Richard Marcellais [D] | Rep. Roger Brabandt [R] |
Rep. Glen Froseth [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 1 nays 46 |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba2179.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0042-01000.pdf |