ND SB2172 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-01 - Signed by Governor 04/01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 25-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to newborn child screening for critical congenital heart defects.
Title
Newborn child screening for critical congenital heart defects.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Spencer Berry [R] | Sen. Larry Robinson [D] | Rep. Jon Nelson [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/01 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2013-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 23 |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-02-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |