ND SB2167 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 26.1-26-31.9 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to insurance producer and consultant continuing education; and to amend and reenact sections 26.1-26-02 and 26.1-26-35 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions relating to insurance producers and consultants.
Title
Definitions relating to insurance producers and consultants.
Sponsors
Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. Shawn Vedaa [R] | Rep. James Kasper [R] | Rep. Scott Louser [R] |
Rep. Randy Schobinger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/06 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 2 |
2019-02-27 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |