ND SB2166 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a grant for substance use disorder and mental health recovery services.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for a grant for substance use disorder and mental health recovery services.
Sponsors
Sen. David Clemens [R] | Sen. Bob Paulson [R] | Sen. Merrill Piepkorn [D] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] |
Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 15 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 15 nays 32 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 1 1 |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:35 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:20 |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Amendment adopted |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Human Services |