ND SB2160 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-52.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public employee telehealth benefits; to provide for a report; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Public employee telehealth benefits; to provide for a report; to provide for application; to provide an expiration date; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Kristin Roers [R] | Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] |
Rep. Todd Porter [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-16 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 43 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 2 0 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:48 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Rereferred to Human Services |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry and Business |