ND SB2159 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 71
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-39.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a sales tax exemption for materials used to construct, expand, or improve a nonprofit hospital; and to provide an effective date.
Title
A sales tax exemption for materials used to construct, expand, or improve a nonprofit hospital; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles Damschen [R] | Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Joe Miller [R] | Sen. Philip Murphy [D] |
Rep. Chet Pollert [R] | Rep. Robin Weisz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-18 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 71 | |
2011-03-17 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-16 | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 0 | |
2011-03-14 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2011-02-24 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee | |
2011-02-22 | Received from Senate | |
2011-02-21 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-02-18 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 1 0 | |
2011-02-07 | Committee Hearing 11:00 | |
2011-02-03 | Amendment adopted | |
2011-02-02 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-18 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |