ND SB2157 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 57-02-11 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to election by a city having a class I assessor to maintain its property assessment records.
Title
Election by a city having a class I assessor to maintain its property assessment records.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Jim Roers [R] | Sen. David Rust [R] |
Rep. David Monson [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-25 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2017-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 15 0 0 |
2017-03-09 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |