ND SB2153 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-20 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 14-10-17.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to emergency care for minors.
Title
Emergency care for minors.
Sponsors
Sen. Carolyn Nelson [D] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. John Grabinger [D] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Rep. Robin Weisz [R] | Rep. Karla Hanson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-01-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-20 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 44 |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |