ND SB2144 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 26.1-21-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to claims against the bonding fund.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 26.1-21-12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to claims against the bonding fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-09 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-06 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-05 | Second reading, passed, yeas 062 nays 030 | |
2009-03-04 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 008 n 004 | |
2009-02-27 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions | |
2009-01-14 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-01-08 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 001 | |
2009-01-08 | Committee Hearing 10:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2144.html |