ND SB2137 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-03 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 41
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 5-01-14 and 5-01-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the sale and transfer of alcoholic beverages by microbrew pubs and brewer taprooms.
Title
The sale and transfer of alcoholic beverages by microbrew pubs and brewer taprooms.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] | Sen. Merrill Piepkorn [D] |
Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-03 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 4 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-03 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 41 |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |