ND SB2135 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-02 - Signed by Governor 04/02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 43-17.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a physician health program.
Title
A physician health program.
Sponsors
Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Tyler Axness [D] | Rep. Todd Porter [R] |
Rep. Karen Rohr [R] | Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/02 |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2013-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 1 |
2013-03-21 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2013-01-30 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |