ND SB2131 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact chapter 26.1-10.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to own risk and solvency assessments of insurers; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Own risk and solvency assessments of insurers; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 2 |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |