ND SB2131 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-23 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-44-04.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to service charges for recycling and disposal of surplus property; and to declare an emergency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-44-04.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to service charges for recycling and disposal of surplus property; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-23 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-22 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-20 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-13 | Second reading passed, y 047 n 000 Emergency clause carried | |
2009-04-13 | Concurred | |
2009-03-18 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2009-03-17 | Emergency clause carried | |
2009-03-17 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-03-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-02-27 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs | |
2009-01-14 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-12 | Second reading, passed, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-01-09 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 005 n 000 | |
2009-01-08 | Committee Hearing 02:30 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2131.html |