ND SB2129 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-27 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 26.1-03.1-01, subsections 2 and 3 of section 26.1-03.1-02, section 26.1-03.1-03, subsection 2 of section 26.1-03.1-04, subdivision a of subsection 2 of section 26.1-03.1-06, and sections 26.1-03.1-07, 26.1-03.1-08, and 26.1-03.1-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to risk-based capital reports of insurers.
Title
Risk-based capital reports of insurers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 0 |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 1 |
2015-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |