ND SB2129 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Signed by Governor 04/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-21.3-04.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state building code and accessibility standards.
Title
The state building code and accessibility standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Lonnie Laffen [R] | Sen. Dwight Cook [R] | Sen. Ronald Sorvaag [R] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] |
Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] | Rep. Gary Sukut [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/24 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-18 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 60 nays 33 |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-17 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-04 | House | Conference committee appointed Sukut Louser M. Nelson |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Klein Andrist Murphy |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-03-26 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 63 nays 29 |
2013-03-21 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-20 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 5 0 |
2013-03-13 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-03-06 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2013-02-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 37 nays 10 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 4 3 0 |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |