ND SB2125 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 64-02-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to public service commission action for weighing or measuring devices that do not meet design or tolerance standards.
Title
Public service commission action for weighing or measuring devices that do not meet design or tolerance standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 79 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 31 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/19 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-13 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 79 nays 11 |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 3 |
2015-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 31 nays 14 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 1 |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |