ND SB2118 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 23.1-15-01, 23.1-15-03, 23.1-15-04, and 23.1-15-05, subsection 1 of section 23.1-15-07, and sections 23.1-15-08 and 23.1-15-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to abandoned motor vehicles; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Abandoned motor vehicles; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Concurred |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-03-21 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2023-03-21 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-03-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-17 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 11:25 |
2023-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-22 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-02-21 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:55 |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Rereferred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-19 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:15 |
2023-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred to Energy and Natural Resources |