ND SB2118 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-20 - Signed by Governor 03/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 39-01-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to mobility impaired parking privilege applications.
Title
Mobility impaired parking privilege applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-01-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/20 |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-17 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 3 |
2015-03-12 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 1 2 |
2015-03-09 | House | Rereferred to Transportation |
2015-03-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2015-03-05 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2015-01-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |