ND SB2117 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 37-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to death benefits for national guard members; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Death benefits for national guard members; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-01-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/19 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-16 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-13 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-12 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2021-04-07 | House | Conference committee appointed Karls Schauer Schneider |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Wobbema Elkin Marcellais |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-18 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-18 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 89 nays 3 |
2021-03-15 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-12 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2021-02-24 | House | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2021-01-18 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |