ND SB2117 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact subsection 12 to section 55-08-01.3 and sections 55-08-18 and 55-08-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to parks and recreation department rule violations and penalties; to amend and reenact section 55-08-17 and subsection 13 of section 55-11-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to parks and recreation department rule violations and penalties; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Parks and recreation department rule violations and penalties; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/20 | |
2011-04-21 | Signed by Governor 04/20 | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-07 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-05 | Concurred | |
2011-03-10 | Returned to Senate (12) | |
2011-03-09 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 72 nays 18 | |
2011-03-08 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-07 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 4 | |
2011-03-03 | Committee Hearing 02:15 | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-01-21 | Received from Senate | |
2011-01-20 | Second reading, passed, yeas 40 nays 6, Emergency clause carried | |
2011-01-19 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-17 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 | |
2011-01-14 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-04 | Introduced, first reading, referred Natural Resources Committee |