ND SB2113 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor 04/20
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-02-08.8 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the property tax credit for disabled veterans and extension of the disabled veterans' property tax credit to the disabled veteran's surviving spouse; and to provide an effective date.
Title
The property tax credit for disabled veterans and extension of the disabled veterans' property tax credit to the disabled veteran's surviving spouse; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/20 |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-04-17 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-04-16 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, placed on calendar (Senate accede) |
2015-04-06 | House | Conference committee appointed Froseth Klein Mitskog |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Bekkedahl Oehlke Triplett |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2015-03-20 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 0 |
2015-03-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-03-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 1 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:30 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |