ND SB2110 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 37-17.1-07.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to hazardous chemical preparedness and response program fees and fines.
Title
Hazardous chemical preparedness and response program fees and fines.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/29 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Concurred |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 81 nays 10 |
2017-03-13 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-10 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2017-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 0 1 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |