ND SB2101 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact section 6-06-14.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to credit union loans; to amend and reenact subsection 3 of section 6-01-01.1, sections 6-01-04.3, 6-01-09, and 6-01-17, subsection 1 of section 6-03-05, sections 6-03-11, 6-03-13.3, and 6-03-15.1, subsection 1 of section 6-03-47.2, sections 6-03-49.1, 6-05-15.4, and 6-06-06, subsection 4 of section 6-06-08, and sections 6-06-11 and 6-08-08.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the regulatory fund, assessment of civil money penalties, appointment of receivers, supervision and examinations, assessments, real estate loans, bank mergers, bank branches, bank investments, trust branches, credit union powers, credit union board notice, and sale or purchase of banking institutions or holding companies; to repeal section 6-06-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to credit union loans; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Title
Credit union loans; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0, Emergency clause carried |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Concurred |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2021-03-24 | House | Emergency clause carried |
2021-03-24 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 1 |
2021-03-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2021-03-17 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2021-02-19 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2021-01-11 | House | Received from Senate |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2021-01-08 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:45 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |