ND SB2100 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 84
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-01 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 84
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of virtual currency.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of virtual currency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-01 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 84 |
2017-02-23 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-02-14 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2017-01-13 | House | Received from Senate |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-01-11 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |