ND SB2089 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15.1-21-02.5 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to eligibility for a North Dakota academic scholarship.
Title
Eligibility for a North Dakota academic scholarship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signed by President |
2015-03-11 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2015-03-06 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 0 |
2015-03-05 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 |
2015-03-04 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 1 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |