ND SB2084 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 046
Status: Introduced on January 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-01-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 046
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-13-08 and 15.1-13-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensing student teachers.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 15.1-13-08 and 15.1-13-14 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to licensing student teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-01-28 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 000 nays 046 | |
2009-01-27 | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-21 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-08 | Rereferred to Judiciary | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Education |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2084.html |