ND SB2083 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-07 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 50-32-01, 50-32-02, 50-32-03, and 50-32-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to assisted living facilities licensing; and to repeal section 50-32-02.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to assisted living facilities.
Title
Assisted living facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 74 |
2015-04-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-04-02 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 0 |
2015-03-16 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2015-02-20 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |
2015-01-27 | House | Received from Senate |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-01-22 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-06 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |