ND SB2081 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 15-03-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a continuing appropriation for investments controlled by the board of university and school lands.
Title
A continuing appropriation for investments controlled by the board of university and school lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - House - House Second reading (Y: 78 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/28 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 78 nays 12 |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 0 2 |
2019-03-08 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-03-08 | House | Reported back, do pass 12 0 2 |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:15 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2019-01-22 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |