ND SB2080 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 61-16.1-38 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the state engineer's authority regarding construction permit thresholds for dikes, dams, and other devices.
Title
The state engineer's authority regarding construction permit thresholds for dikes, dams, and other devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-21 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 3 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-21 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 3 nays 44 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2021-01-07 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |