ND SB2080 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Signed by Governor 03/06
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 4.1-31-01.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the federal meat inspection revision.
Title
The federal meat inspection revision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Second reading (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-07 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/06 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2019-03-01 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 85 nays 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 11 0 3 |
2019-02-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2019-01-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Agriculture Committee |