ND SB2080 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-27 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota state university extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; and to provide an exemption.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation for defraying the expenses of the North Dakota state university extension service, northern crops institute, upper great plains transportation institute, main research center, branch research centers, and agronomy seed farm; and to provide an exemption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 0 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-27 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 0 nays 45 |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on consent calendar 14 0 0 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 01:30 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2017-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |