ND SB2074 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Signed by Governor 04/26
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection
Title
Penalties for insurance fraud; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/26 |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-24 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-23 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 83 nays 9 |
2013-04-23 | House | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-23 | House | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Reported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar |
2013-04-18 | House | Conference committee appointed Klemin Brabandt Hanson |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Conference committee appointed Armstrong Sitte Grabinger |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Refused to concur |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 86 nays 4 |
2013-04-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-03-19 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-02-21 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-02-20 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0 |
2013-01-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |