ND SB2073 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 59-04.2-17 and 59-04.2-28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to payments under the Uniform Principal and Income Act.
Title
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 59-04.2-17 and 59-04.2-28 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to payments under the Uniform Principal and Income Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-09 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-05 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-04 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-03-03 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 011 n 000 | |
2009-03-03 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-10 | Received from Senate | |
2009-02-09 | Second reading, passed, yeas 043 nays 000 | |
2009-02-05 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-01-26 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2073.html |