ND SB2071 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-19 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Rep. Ruby, N. Johnson A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 65-01-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workers' compensation presumption of employment.
Title
Introduced by Rep. Ruby, N. Johnson A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 65-01-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the workers' compensation presumption of employment.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-19 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-03-19 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-03-18 | Signed by President | |
2009-03-09 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-03-04 | Returned to Senate | |
2009-03-03 | Second reading, passed, yeas 092 nays 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Reported back, do pass, placed on calendar y 012 n 000 | |
2009-03-02 | Committee Hearing 08:00 | |
2009-02-13 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor | |
2009-01-26 | Received from Senate | |
2009-01-23 | Second reading, passed, yeas 043 nays 000 | |
2009-01-22 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-21 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 007 n 000 | |
2009-01-19 | Committee Hearing 02:00 | |
2009-01-06 | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba2071.html |