ND SB2060 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-24 - Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact subsection 7 of section 10-04-07.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees of an effective offering; and to amend and reenact subsection 17 of section 10-04-06, subsection 5 of section 10-04-08.4, sections 10-04-10, 10-04-10.1, and 10-04-10.3, subsection 1 of section 10-04-16, and subsection 1 of section 10-04-16.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exempt transaction filling requirements, federal crowdfunding, investment advisors' custody, postregistration recordkeeping, effectiveness of orders, and professional services for investigations.
Title
Exempt transaction filling requirements, federal crowdfunding, investment advisors' custody, postregistration recordkeeping, effectiveness of orders, and professional services for investigations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-08 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-01-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 03/15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/14 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2023-03-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry, Business and Labor |
2023-01-09 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 0 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 0 0 |
2023-01-04 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:15 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Industry and Business |