ND SB2060 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-52.6 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to plan modifications to the public employees retirement system defined contribution retirement plan required to maintain compliance with the Internal Revenue Code; to amend and reenact sections 39-03.1-11.2, 39-03.1-29, subsection 11 of section 54-52-04, sections 54-52-17, 54-52-23, 54-52-28, 54-52.3-03, and 54-52.6-13 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to incorporation of Internal Revenue Code compliance under the highway patrolmen's retirement plan and public employees retirement system, updating appropriate committee designations for the savings clauses under the highway patrolmen's retirement plan and public employees retirement system, the board's authority to fund administrative expenses, normal retirement dates for a peace officer or correctional officer, normal retirement dates for a national guard security officer or firefighter, normal retirement dates for a peace officer employed by the bureau of criminal investigation, removal of the level social security retirement benefit option under the public employees retirement system, defrayal of expenses associated with the pretax benefits program, and distribution of a deceased participant's accumulated account balance under the defined contribution retirement plan; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Title
Incorporation of Internal Revenue Code compliance under the highway patrolmen's retirement plan and public employees retirement system, updating appropriate committee designations for the savings clauses under the highway patrolmen's retirement plan and public employees retirement system, the board's authority to fund administrative expenses, normal retirement dates for a peace officer or correctional officer, normal retirement dates for a national guard security officer or firefighter, normal retirement dates for a peace officer employed by the bureau of criminal investigation, removal of the level social security retirement benefit option under the public employees retirement system, defrayal of expenses associated with the pretax benefits program, and distribution of a deceased participant's accumulated account balance under the defined contribution retirement plan; and to provide a continuing appropriation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2013-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-04-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 0 3 |
2013-03-29 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-03-07 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2013-01-31 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 12 0 1 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2013-01-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |