ND SB2046 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 12.1-04-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fitness to proceed.
Title
Fitness to proceed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Concurred |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-03-15 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 82 nays 10 |
2023-03-10 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-09 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 2 2 |
2023-03-08 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2023-02-09 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |
2023-01-12 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Judiciary |