ND SB2046 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Transportation Committee) AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 7 of section 39-06-04, section 39-06.2-02, subsection 1 of section 39-06.2-06, and sections 39-06.2-07, 39-06.2-08, 39-06.2-08.1, 39-06.2-09, 39-06.2-09.1, 39-06.2-10, 39-06.2-10.5, 39-06.2-12, and 39-06.2-16 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial driver's licenses.
Title
Commercial driver's licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/08 |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 0 |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Concurred |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 52 nays 40 |
2013-03-19 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-18 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:45 |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2013-01-24 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-23 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 11:15 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |