ND SB2041 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-11 - Signed by Governor 04/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Transportation Committee) AN ACT to amend and reenact subsections
Title
Impounding and destroying number plates for certain offenses; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/11 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Concurred |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2013-03-25 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 92 nays 0 |
2013-03-20 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-19 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 1 2 |
2013-03-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2013-01-29 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-01-25 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-16 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |