ND SB2040 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 6-09.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bonded debt repayments; to amend and reenact sections 6-09.4-06, 6-09.4-10, and 15.1-36-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to borrowing and lending authority of the public finance authority, reserve funds associated with bonds, and the school construction assistance revolving loan fund; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a bond issue limit.
Title
Borrowing and lending authority of the public finance authority, reserve funds associated with bonds, and the school construction assistance revolving loan fund; to provide an appropriation; and to provide a bond issue limit.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Mathern [D] | Sen. Joan Heckaman [D] | Sen. Erin Oban [D] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] |
Rep. Gretchen Dobervich [D] | Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 7 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | Senate | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 40 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 2 0 |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 08:30 |
2021-01-05 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |