ND SB2040 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Signed by Governor 03/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
(Transportation Committee) AN ACT to create and enact section 39-06.2-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to fees for commercial driver's licenses; and to amend and reenact sections 39-06.2-07, 39-06.2-08, 39-06.2-09, 39-06.2-09.1, and 39-06.2-13.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial driver's licenses.
Title
Commercial driver's licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor 03/27 |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-03-22 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Returned to Senate |
2013-03-19 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 1 |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1 |
2013-03-14 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2013-01-16 | House | Received from Senate |
2013-01-15 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2013-01-11 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-01-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:45 |
2013-01-08 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |