ND SB2036 | 2023-2024 | 68th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-17 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact twelve new sections to chapter 61-16.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to water resource boards; to amend and reenact sections 21-06-07, 61-01-06, 61-05-02.1, 61-16.1-02, 61-16.1-09, 61-16.1-09.1, 61-16.1-15, 61-16.1-17, 61-16.1-18, 61-16.1-19, 61-16.1-20, 61-16.1-21, 61-16.1-22, 61-16.1-23, 61-16.1-24, 61-16.1-26, 61-16.1-27, 61-16.1-28, 61-16.1-42, 61-16.1-43, 61-16.1-51, and 61-16.1-54, and subdivision g of subsection 4 of section 61-32-03.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to water resource boards and procedures for assessment projects undertaken by water resource boards; and to repeal section 61-16.1-01 and chapter 61-21 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to water resource districts, water resource boards, assessment procedures and requirements, and drains.
Title
Water resource districts, water resource boards, assessment procedures and requirements, and drains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-06 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-01-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-17 | Senate | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/13 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Signed by President |
2023-04-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Concurred |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:18 |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Returned to Senate (12) |
2023-04-03 | House | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 73 nays 19 |
2023-04-03 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-03-31 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2023-03-30 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2023-03-02 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-02-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |
2023-01-31 | House | Received from Senate |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Rereferred to Agriculture and Veterans Affairs |
2023-01-06 | Senate | Request return from committee |
2023-01-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred to Energy and Natural Resources |